TN HB2179 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 623
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 623
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, excludes from the definition of "pre-need funeral contract" and regulation, as a contract of insurance, a travel protection agreement for the coordination and arranging of all professional services related to the preparation for the purpose of transportation and subsequent transportation of a dead human body. - Amends TCA Title 56 and Title 62, Chapter 5, Part 4.
Title
As enacted, excludes from the definition of "pre-need funeral contract" and regulation, as a contract of insurance, a travel protection agreement for the coordination and arranging of all professional services related to the preparation for the purpose of transportation and subsequent transportation of a dead human body. - Amends TCA Title 56 and Title 62, Chapter 5, Part 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 623 | |
2018-03-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-12 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-03-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/12/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/8/2018 |
2018-02-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2018-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1973 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-06 - Pub. Ch. 623