TN HB2174 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 808
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 808
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts "Kari's Law," which requires an entity that owns or controls a telephone system that is capable of outbound dialing or access to configure the telephone system to allow a person initiating a 911 call on the telephone system direct access to 911 service without an additional code, digit, prefix, postfix, or trunk access code; and an entity that owns or operates a residential or business facility utilizing a telephone system so configured to configure the telephone system to provide notification to a central location on the site of the residential or business facility when a person within the facility dials 911. - Amends TCA Title 7; Title 9; Title 65 and Title 68.
Title
As enacted, enacts "Kari's Law," which requires an entity that owns or controls a telephone system that is capable of outbound dialing or access to configure the telephone system to allow a person initiating a 911 call on the telephone system direct access to 911 service without an additional code, digit, prefix, postfix, or trunk access code; and an entity that owns or operates a residential or business facility utilizing a telephone system so configured to configure the telephone system to provide notification to a central location on the site of the residential or business facility when a person within the facility dials 911. - Amends TCA Title 7; Title 9; Title 65 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 808 | |
2016-03-31 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-31 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2016-03-24 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/31/2016 |
2016-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/24/2016 |
2016-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/22/2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/16/2016 |
2016-03-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-02 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/16/2016 |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/2/2016 |
2016-02-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-02-17 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/2/2016 |
2016-02-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/17/2016 |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2016-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | P1C. |
2016-01-21 | House | Intro. |
2016-01-21 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2137 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-26 - Pub. Ch. 808
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2174&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB2174.pdf |