TN HB2168 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-17 - H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/18/2020
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-17 - H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/18/2020
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the Tennessee Child Care Task Force. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 49 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, creates the Tennessee Child Care Task Force. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 49 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. Harold Love [D] | Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] | Rep. Sam Whitson [R] |
Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/18/2020 |
2020-06-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/16/2020 |
2020-06-16 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-16 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/16/2020 |
2020-06-16 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/10/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-06-02 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 6/2/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2253 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/25/2020