TN HB2159 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-12 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-12 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the office of the secretary of state to report to the general assembly on its ability to perform random audits of ballots cast in every primary and general election held in this state. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, relative to election security.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. Glen Casada [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-04-12 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-04-11 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2022-04-11 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0882) |
2022-04-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-07 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/2022 |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/7/2022 |
2022-04-05 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/5/2022 |
2022-03-29 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 4/5/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-03-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2059 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-22 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0