TN HB2155 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Assigned to s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Assigned to s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes from December 31 to January 1, the date each year by which the bureau of workers' compensation must produce a report that includes a listing of the name of each covered employer that failed, during the preceding state fiscal year, to provide workers' compensation coverage or qualify as a self-insured employer as required by law. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 50, Chapter 6 and Title 56.
Title
As introduced, changes from December 31 to January 1, the date each year by which the bureau of workers' compensation must produce a report that includes a listing of the name of each covered employer that failed, during the preceding state fiscal year, to provide workers' compensation coverage or qualify as a self-insured employer as required by law. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 50, Chapter 6 and Title 56.
Sponsors
Rep. Clark Boyd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2860 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee