TN HB2154 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-04 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes from July 1 to January 31 the date by which the bureau of workers' compensation must report its findings on the impact of the Workers' Compensation Reform Act of 2013 on the workers' compensation system in this state to each member of the general assembly; requires the bureau to provide an annual presentation of its findings by January 31 each year to the consumer and human resources committee of the house of representatives and the commerce and labor committee of the senate. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 50, Chapter 6 and Title 56.
Title
As introduced, changes from July 1 to January 31 the date by which the bureau of workers' compensation must report its findings on the impact of the Workers' Compensation Reform Act of 2013 on the workers' compensation system in this state to each member of the general assembly; requires the bureau to provide an annual presentation of its findings by January 31 each year to the consumer and human resources committee of the house of representatives and the commerce and labor committee of the senate. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 50, Chapter 6 and Title 56.
Sponsors
Rep. Clark Boyd [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-06-02 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-06-02 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-06-02 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0647) |
2020-05-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/1/2020 |
2020-03-20 | House | Reset on Regular Cal. for 6-1-20 |
2020-03-18 | House | Reset on Regular Cal. for 3-20-20 |
2020-03-16 | House | Reset on cal. for 3/19/2020 |
2020-03-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/16/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/12/2020 |
2020-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Consumer and Human Resources Committee for 3/9/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Employee Affairs Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-02-03 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2861 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee