TN HB2154 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Def. to TACIR in Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, revises certain circumstances under which the commissioner of revenue must not include or retain a non-participating manufacturer in the directory of certified tobacco product manufacturers. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, revises certain circumstances under which the commissioner of revenue must not include or retain a non-participating manufacturer in the directory of certified tobacco product manufacturers. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18HouseDef. to TACIR in Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-04-18HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/18/2018
2018-04-18HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-04-11HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2018
2018-04-11HousePlaced behind the budget
2018-04-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/11/2018
2018-04-09HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/11/2018
2018-04-04HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/9/2018
2018-04-03HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to Next Calendar
2018-03-28HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2018
2018-03-21HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/4/2018
2018-03-14HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018
2018-03-14HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2018-03-13HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-03-07HousePlaced on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/13/2018
2018-03-07HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
2018-02-28HousePlaced on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/7/2018
2018-02-28HouseAction Def. in s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/7/2018
2018-02-21HousePlaced on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 2/28/2018
2018-02-05HouseAssigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
2018-02-05HouseP2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee --Finance, Ways & Means
2018-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2018-01-31HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1989 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2018

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback