TN HB2150 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the professional art therapist advisory committee of the board of examiners in psychology to regulate the practice of art therapy. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 63.
Title
As introduced, creates the professional art therapist advisory committee of the board of examiners in psychology to regulate the practice of art therapy. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 63.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | Held on desk. |
2018-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/19/2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/19/2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-04-10 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/10/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-02-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2018-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2127 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-14 - Refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee