TN HB2149 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 962
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 962
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, renames the Carroll County 1,000 Acre Lake to Lake Halford; transfers responsibility for administering the Carroll County 1,000 Acre Lake from the Carroll County watershed authority to the TWRA and imposes certain requirements on TWRA in regard to the transfer. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 11; Title 64, Chapter 1, Part 8 and Title 70.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 11; Title 64, Chapter 1, Part 8 and Title 70, relative to the Carroll County watershed.
Sponsors
Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. Curtis Halford [R] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] |
Rep. Ryan Williams [R] | Rep. Clark Boyd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 962 | |
2022-04-11 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-04-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-07 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/2022 |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/7/2022 |
2022-04-05 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/5/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-15 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Action Def. in s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee to 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | No Action Taken |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2022-02-16 | House | Ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2402 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-06 - Effective date(s) 04/29/2022