TN HB2148 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-7)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 885
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-7)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 885
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates the Tennessee Center for Nursing Advancement within East Tennessee State University to address issues of nursing workforce needs and makes other related changes. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 8, Part 5; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 8, Part 5; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to the Tennessee Center for Nursing Advancement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 885 | |
2022-03-28 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-03-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-24 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/28/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/24/2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-03-02 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-22 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2022-02-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 2/22/2022 |
2022-02-15 | House | Action Def. in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee to 2/22/2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 2/15/2022 |
2022-02-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2401 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022