TN HB2148 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - Taken off notice for cal. in Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - Taken off notice for cal. in Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds consultation with the bureau of TennCare to the provision authorizing the commissioner of health to request early completion of the joint annual report of statistical particulars relative to a hospital's patients or special reports. - Amends TCA Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, adds consultation with the bureau of TennCare to the provision authorizing the commissioner of health to request early completion of the joint annual report of statistical particulars relative to a hospital's patients or special reports. - Amends TCA Title 63 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Health Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-13 | House | Action def. in Health Committee to 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/13/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2018-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2643 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health & Welfare Committee