TN HB2146 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Historic Properties Act." - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 13.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Historic Properties Act." - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 13.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/28/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2018-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2109 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee