TN HB2140 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal. in Business and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal. in Business and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the utility management review board to authorize the private purchase of a utility district; deems such utility district upon sale and transfer of control a public utility for purposes of regulation by the Tennessee public utility commission. - Amends TCA Title 7 and Title 65.
Title
As introduced, authorizes the utility management review board to authorize the private purchase of a utility district; deems such utility district upon sale and transfer of control a public utility for purposes of regulation by the Tennessee public utility commission. - Amends TCA Title 7 and Title 65.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Business and Utilities Committee |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Action def. in Business and Utilities Committee to 3/21/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 3/14/2018 |
2018-03-06 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2018-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2018-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2018-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2373 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee