TN HB2129 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 874
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 874
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, transfers assets held in the wildlife management endowment fund to a newly created lifetime sportsman endowment fund, which will be an irrevocable trust for the exclusive benefit of lifetime sportsman license holders; revises other related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 9 and Title 70.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 9 and Title 70, relative to proceeds from sales of lifetime licenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Pat Marsh [R] | Rep. Bob Freeman [D] | Rep. Bill Beck [D] | Rep. Ryan Williams [R] |
Rep. Ron Travis [R] | Rep. Tim Hicks [R] | Rep. Greg Vital [R] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 874 | |
2022-04-04 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-04-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-31 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/31/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2022-03-01 | House | Ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2118 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Effective date(s) 04/14/2022