TN HB2129 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 53-15)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1008
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts the "School Safety Act of 2018". - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3; Title 16; Title 36, Chapter 3, Part 6; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 49; Section 50-3-201; Section 58-1-112; Section 70-4-123 and Section 70-5-101.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, enacts the "School Safety Act of 2018". - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 3; Title 16; Title 36, Chapter 3, Part 6; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 49; Section 50-3-201; Section 58-1-112; Section 70-4-123 and Section 70-5-101.

Sponsors

Rep. James Van Huss [R]Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D]Rep. Tilman Goins [R]Rep. Timothy Hill [R]
Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R]Rep. Jason Zachary [R]Rep. Cameron Sexton [R]Rep. Jerome Moon [R]
Rep. Bill Dunn [R]Rep. Susan Lynn [R]Rep. Dennis Powers [R]Rep. Glen Casada [R]
Rep. John Forgety [R]Rep. Bo Mitchell [D]Rep. Johnnie Turner [D]Rep. Mike Stewart [D]
Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D]Rep. Darren Jernigan [D]Rep. Brenda Gilmore [D]Rep. John DeBerry [D]
Rep. Harold Love [D]Rep. Joe Pitts [D]Rep. Barbara Cooper [D]Rep. Ron Lollar [R]
Rep. Sabi Kumar [R]Rep. Courtney Rogers [R]Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R]Rep. David Alexander [R]
Rep. Mike Sparks [R]Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R]Rep. Judd Matheny [R]Rep. Jerry Sexton [R]
Rep. John Ragan [R]Rep. Tim Rudd [R]Rep. Dan Howell [R]Rep. Jimmy Matlock [R]
Rep. Ron Gant [R]Rep. Barry Doss [R]Rep. Andy Holt [R]Rep. Bud Hulsey [R]
Rep. Jeremy Faison [R]Rep. Matthew Hill [R]Rep. Jay Reedy [R]Rep. Sheila Butt [R]
Rep. Dawn White [R]Rep. Curtis Johnson [R]Rep. Paul Sherrell [R]Rep. Beth Harwell [R]
Rep. Thomas Tillis [R]Rep. Gregory Terry [R]Rep. Jimmy Eldridge [R]Rep. Sam Whitson [R]
Rep. Jim Coley [R]Rep. Craig Fitzhugh [D]Rep. John Windle [D]Rep. David Byrd [R]
Rep. Clark Boyd [R]Rep. Michael Curcio [R]Rep. Gary Hicks [R]Rep. Roger Kane [R]
Rep. Mark White [R]Rep. Debra Moody [R]Rep. Kent Calfee [R]Rep. Jason Powell [D]
Rep. Ron Travis [R]Rep. Kevin Brooks [R]Rep. Kelly Keisling [R]Rep. Larry Miller [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1008
2018-04-25HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-04-25HouseComp. SB subst.
2018-04-24HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-04-24HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/25/2018
2018-04-24HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/24/2018
2018-04-24HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2018-04-23HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/23/2018
2018-04-23HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-04-19HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/23/2018
2018-04-18HouseReset on Final cal. of Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2018-04-11HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2018
2018-04-09HousePlaced behind the budget
2018-04-05HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-04-04HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/9/2018
2018-04-04HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2018-04-04HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-04-03HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-04-02HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-28HousePlaced on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/3/2018
2018-03-27HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Education Administration & Planning
2018-03-21HousePlaced on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/27/2018
2018-03-20HouseAction def. in Civil Justice Committee to 3/27/2018
2018-03-15HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-14HousePlaced on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/20/2018
2018-03-13HouseAction def. in Civil Justice Committee to 3/20/2018
2018-03-12HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-08HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-07HousePlaced on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/13/2018
2018-03-07HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2018-03-05HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-01HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-28HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/7/2018
2018-02-26HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-20HouseAssigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
2018-02-20HouseReassigned to Civil Justice Committee-- Education Administration and Planning
2018-02-05HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2018-02-05HouseP2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2018-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2018-01-31HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB2059 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1008

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback