TN HB2126 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Effective date(s) 04/08/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Effective date(s) 04/08/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes a rural electric and community services cooperative to allow directors or cooperative members to participate in cooperative meetings by means of virtual or remote communication if certain conditions are met. - Amends TCA Title 65.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 65, relative to electric cooperatives.
Sponsors
Rep. Curtis Johnson [R] | Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Greg Vital [R] |
Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. Ron Travis [R] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Effective date(s) 04/08/2022 | |
2022-04-13 | Pub. Ch. 811 | |
2022-04-08 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-03-31 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-03-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-03-25 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-03-08 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-03-07 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-03-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-03 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/7/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/3/2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 2/23/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2138 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 811