TN HB2126 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-17 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-17 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a local law enforcement agency to submit a sexual assault evidence collection kit to the state crime lab or other similar qualified laboratory for testing within 45 days of a victim filing a police report, rather than within 60 days. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 6 and Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 5.
Title
As introduced, requires a local law enforcement agency to submit a sexual assault evidence collection kit to the state crime lab or other similar qualified laboratory for testing within 45 days of a victim filing a police report, rather than within 60 days. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 6 and Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 5.
Sponsors
Rep. Brandon Ogles [R] | Rep. Bob Freeman [D] | Rep. Jim Coley [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-06-16 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-06-16 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-06-16 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0952) |
2020-06-16 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0926) |
2020-06-11 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/8/2020 |
2020-06-02 | House | Action def. in Judiciary Committee to 6/9/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/2/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2020-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2020-02-03 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2211 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee