TN HB2124 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 696
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 696
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates seat designations for commissioners; allows voters to vote for one commissioner for each open, designated seat. - Amends TCA Section 6-20-101.
Title
As enacted, creates seat designations for commissioners; allows voters to vote for one commissioner for each open, designated seat. - Amends TCA Section 6-20-101.
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Carr [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 696 | |
2016-03-14 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2016-03-10 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/14/2016 |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/10/2016 |
2016-03-01 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/1/2016 |
2016-02-23 | House | Action def. in Local Government Committee to 3/1/2016 |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 2/23/2016 |
2016-02-17 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 2/17/2016 |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2016-01-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | P1C. |
2016-01-21 | House | Intro. |
2016-01-21 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2087 (Crossfiled) 2016-04-08 - Pub. Ch. 696