TN HB2115 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 794
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 794
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, removes the geographic or programmatic considerations when THEC adopts a dual admissions policy in which a person who satisfies the admissions requirements of a two-year institution governed by the board of regents and a public university while pursuing a degree program within a transfer pathway program of study is authorized to be admitted to both such institutions. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7 and Title 49, Chapter 8.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 7 and Title 49, Chapter 8, relative to dual admissions.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Eldridge [R] | Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] | Rep. Justin Lafferty [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] |
Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] | Rep. Chris Hurt [R] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 794 | |
2022-03-21 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-03-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-17 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/21/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/17/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee |
2022-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2022-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2531 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-13 - Effective date(s) 04/08/2022