TN HB2112 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-4)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 656
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-4)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 656
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes a method of apportionment that may be elected by financial asset management companies for franchise and excise tax purposes. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 20 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 21.
Title
As enacted, establishes a method of apportionment that may be elected by financial asset management companies for franchise and excise tax purposes. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 20 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 21.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 656 | |
2018-03-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-22 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-03-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-19 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/22/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/15/2018 |
2018-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/13/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-03-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-03-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-30 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2256 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-11 - Pub. Ch. 656