TN HB2111 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Failed in Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Failed in Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes from March 1 to April 1 the date by which the department of safety must submit an annual seizure report to the speakers of the senate and house of representatives and to the chairs of the judiciary committee of the senate, civil justice committee of the house of representatives, and criminal justice committee of the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 14; Title 8, Chapter 7; Title 38, Chapter 6; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4; Title 40 and Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 4.
Title
As introduced, changes from March 1 to April 1 the date by which the department of safety must submit an annual seizure report to the speakers of the senate and house of representatives and to the chairs of the judiciary committee of the senate, civil justice committee of the house of representatives, and criminal justice committee of the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 14; Title 8, Chapter 7; Title 38, Chapter 6; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4; Title 40 and Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-23 - House - FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Failed in Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | House | Failed in Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-12 | House | Re-ref. Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-04-10 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/10/2018 |
2018-04-02 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to Next Calendar |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/2/2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/27/2018 |
2018-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2018-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-30 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2062 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.