TN HB2110 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1046
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1046
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, renames the "DUI monitoring fund" as the "electronic monitoring indigency fund" and requires the assessment of fees against persons who are convicted of certain offenses, the proceeds of which will be deposited into the fund. - Amends TCA Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 4 and Title 69, Chapter 9.
Title
As enacted, renames the "DUI monitoring fund" as the "electronic monitoring indigency fund" and requires the assessment of fees against persons who are convicted of certain offenses, the proceeds of which will be deposited into the fund. - Amends TCA Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 4 and Title 69, Chapter 9.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Pub. Ch. 1046 | |
2018-05-23 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2018 | |
2018-05-21 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-05-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-05-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-27 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA1044) |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-04-18 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-17 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2018-04-17 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1185) |
2018-04-12 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/11/2018 |
2018-04-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-04-10 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/10/2018 |
2018-04-02 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to Next Calendar |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/2/2018 |
2018-03-27 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/13/2018 |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2018-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-30 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2711 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1046