TN HB2108 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Effective date(s) 05/04/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Effective date(s) 05/04/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires that all math, science, and social studies textbooks and instructional materials be aligned to state academic standards by a certain date; prohibits the state board of education from granting waivers for textbooks or instructional materials, including those for English language arts, that are not aligned to state academic standards by that date. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 6, relative to instructional materials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Effective date(s) 05/04/2022 | |
2022-05-09 | Pub. Ch. 990 | |
2022-05-04 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-04-22 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-20 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-19 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-04-18 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 92, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB2108 |
2022-04-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-14 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar 4/18/22 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0852) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-03-17 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-03-17 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-03-17 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0580) |
2022-03-10 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/17/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/10/2022 |
2022-03-07 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-03 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/7/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. Government Operations Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Education Instruction for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-22 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 2/22/2022 |
2022-02-02 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee |
2022-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Instruction -- Government Operations for Review |
2022-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-27 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2154 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 990