TN HB2108 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-05 - Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-05 - Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases time nominating petitions are available from 90 days before the qualifying deadline to 120 days before the qualifying deadline. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 5; Title 2, Chapter 7 and Title 2, Chapter 9.
Title
As introduced, increases time nominating petitions are available from 90 days before the qualifying deadline to 120 days before the qualifying deadline. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 5; Title 2, Chapter 7 and Title 2, Chapter 9.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2018-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-30 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2072 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee