TN HB2107 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds William R. Moore College of Technology as an eligible institution for receipt of the Tennessee reconnect and dual enrollment grants. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, adds William R. Moore College of Technology as an eligible institution for receipt of the Tennessee reconnect and dual enrollment grants. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-26 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 5/26/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Action Def. in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee to Lottery Calendar. |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee |
2020-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2020-02-03 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2031 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee