TN HB2104 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1000
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1000
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends pilot project for assisted outpatient treatment for two years until June 30, 2015. - Amends TCA Title 33, Chapter 6, Part 6.
Title
As enacted, extends pilot project for assisted outpatient treatment for two years until June 30, 2015. - Amends TCA Title 33, Chapter 6, Part 6.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) HEALTH COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) HEALTH SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Health Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-26 - House - (VOICE VOTE) HEALTH COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) HEALTH SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Health Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1000 |
2014-04-16 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2014-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-04-15 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-04-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2014 |
2014-04-08 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to last calendar |
2014-04-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/8/2014 |
2014-04-02 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to next calendar |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/2/2014 |
2014-03-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2014-03-26 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Health Committee |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/12/2014 |
2014-03-05 | House | Action Def. in Health Committee to 3/12/2014 |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/5/2014 |
2014-02-26 | House | Action Def. in Health Committee to 3/5/2014 |
2014-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 2/26/2014 |
2014-02-18 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/18/2014 |
2014-02-11 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 2/18/2014 |
2014-02-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 2/11/2014 |
2014-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2014-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2014-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-27 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2256 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 1000