TN HB2103 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 549
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 549
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, removes existing references to "felony" thefts of amounts less than $1,000 from the definition of a non-violent property offense to align with changes made to theft valuations in the Public Safety Act of 2016, under which such thefts are misdemeanors. - Amends TCA Section 40-35-122.
Title
As enacted, removes existing references to "felony" thefts of amounts less than $1,000 from the definition of a non-violent property offense to align with changes made to theft valuations in the Public Safety Act of 2016, under which such thefts are misdemeanors. - Amends TCA Section 40-35-122.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 549 | |
2018-02-26 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-02-22 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/26/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/22/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-13 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/13/2018 |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2018-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-30 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2118 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-13 - Pub. Ch. 549