TN HB2101 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, adds advanced practice registered nurses and physician assistants as healthcare providers from whom an injured employee may choose to receive treatment in a workers' compensation case, in addition to physicians, surgeons, and chiropractors. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, adds advanced practice registered nurses and physician assistants as healthcare providers from whom an injured employee may choose to receive treatment in a workers' compensation case, in addition to physicians, surgeons, and chiropractors. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee of Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Employee Affairs Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee to 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Employee Affairs Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee |
2020-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2761 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee