TN HB2101 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 625
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 625
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits law enforcement agencies and certain state departments from storing license plate records collected via automatic license plate readers for longer than 90 days, unless the date is retained or stored as part of an ongoing investigation. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 3.
Title
As enacted, prohibits law enforcement agencies and certain state departments from storing license plate records collected via automatic license plate readers for longer than 90 days, unless the date is retained or stored as part of an ongoing investigation. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-11 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-05 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Transportation Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-11 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-05 - House - (VOICE VOTE) TRANSPORTATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Transportation Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | House | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 625 |
2014-03-17 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2014-03-13 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/17/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/13/2014 |
2014-03-11 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/11/2014 |
2014-03-05 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2014-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/5/2014 |
2014-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2014-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2014-01-29 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-27 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1664 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-14 - Pub. Ch. 625