TN HB2095 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows a parent or legal guardian of a minor to waive a claim against a person or entity for personal injury or death resulting from negligence related to an inherent risk of certain activities. - Amends TCA Title 29; Title 37 and Title 47.
Title
As introduced, allows a parent or legal guardian of a minor to waive a claim against a person or entity for personal injury or death resulting from negligence related to an inherent risk of certain activities. - Amends TCA Title 29; Title 37 and Title 47.
Sponsors
Rep. Glen Casada [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-07 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/7/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2018-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-30 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1940 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee