TN HB2094 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, imposes public notice and public input requirements on a redistricting committee and upon consideration of a final redistricting plan. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 16, Part 1 and Title 3.
Title
As introduced, imposes public notice and public input requirements on a redistricting committee and upon consideration of a final redistricting plan. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 16, Part 1 and Title 3.
Sponsors
Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D] | Rep. Jason Potts [D] | Rep. Jason Hodges [D] | Rep. Johnny Shaw [D] |
Rep. Bo Mitchell [D] | Sen. London Lamar [D] | Rep. John Clemmons [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Action Def. in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee to 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee |
2020-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1784 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-27 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee