TN HB2094 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 580
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 580
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises various provisions relative to surplus lines insurance. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 14.
Title
As enacted, revises various provisions relative to surplus lines insurance. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 14.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 580 | |
2018-03-05 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-03-01 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/5/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/1/2018 |
2018-02-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 2/27/2018 |
2018-02-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 2/21/2018 |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2018-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-30 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2510 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-26 - Pub. Ch. 580