TN HB2092 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes the purposes for which surplus revenues collected from the privilege tax on contracted vehicles exiting the Nashville International Airport may be used from a reserve fund for future debt service to the general fund of the county for any county purpose. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 4, Part 2.
Title
As introduced, changes the purposes for which surplus revenues collected from the privilege tax on contracted vehicles exiting the Nashville International Airport may be used from a reserve fund for future debt service to the general fund of the county for any county purpose. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 4, Part 2.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2020-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2510 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee