TN HB2088 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Failed for lack of second in: Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Failed for lack of second in: Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes timelines and requirements for the return of schools operated as part of the achievement school district (ASD) to LEAs; prohibits, after the effective date of the act, any school from being assigned to the ASD and the ASD from executing, approving, authorizing, or renewing any contract, charter school application, or charter agreement; abolishes the ASD as an organizational unit of the department of education on July 1, 2019 or when the last charter agreement with the ASD expires, whichever is later. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, establishes timelines and requirements for the return of schools operated as part of the achievement school district (ASD) to LEAs; prohibits, after the effective date of the act, any school from being assigned to the ASD and the ASD from executing, approving, authorizing, or renewing any contract, charter school application, or charter agreement; abolishes the ASD as an organizational unit of the department of education on July 1, 2019 or when the last charter agreement with the ASD expires, whichever is later. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | Failed for lack of second in: Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2018-03-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/27/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/20/2018 |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2018-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2018-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-30 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2429 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee