TN HB2079 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that the offense of indecent exposure does not include the knowing performance of an excretory function in a public place when performed without intent to abuse, torment, harass, or embarrass another person, or attain sexual arousal or gratification. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13 and Title 40, Chapter 39.
Title
As introduced, clarifies that the offense of indecent exposure does not include the knowing performance of an excretory function in a public place when performed without intent to abuse, torment, harass, or embarrass another person, or attain sexual arousal or gratification. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13 and Title 40, Chapter 39.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | House | Withdrawn. |
2020-02-18 | House | Failed for lack of second in: Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/18/2020 |
2020-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2020-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2020-02-03 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2822 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee