TN HB2078 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-05 - Assigned to s/c Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-05 - Assigned to s/c Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Hearing Enhancement Aid Reimbursement (HEAR) Act." - Amends TCA Title 8 and Title 56, Chapter 7.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Hearing Enhancement Aid Reimbursement (HEAR) Act." - Amends TCA Title 8 and Title 56, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee |
2020-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1795 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee