TN HB2069 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes licensed money transmitters to maintain their records electronically for the prescribed statutory period of three years. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 9; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48 and Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 9; Title 45; Title 47; Title 48 and Title 67, relative to financial institutions.
Sponsors
Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-13 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/13/2022 |
2022-04-06 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/13/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-03-21 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/21/2022 |
2022-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Assigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-03-02 | House | Ref. to Commerce Committee -- Government Operations for Review |
2022-02-02 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2022-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-27 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2088 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-15 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0