TN HB2068 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 855
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, imposes suspension or revocation of license for violations in the marketing of alcohol and drug treatment services. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 39; Title 63 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, imposes suspension or revocation of license for violations in the marketing of alcohol and drug treatment services. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 39; Title 63 and Title 68.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08 Pub. Ch. 855
2018-05-08 Effective date(s) 07/01/2018
2018-05-03 Signed by Governor.
2018-04-26HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2018-04-25SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-04-24HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-04-24HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2018-04-23HouseH. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 91, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB2068
2018-04-19HouseH. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/23/2018
2018-04-19SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 29, Nays 0
2018-04-19SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA1051)
2018-04-19SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2018-04-11SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2018-04-05HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2018-04-05HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0
2018-04-05HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-04-05HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0810)
2018-03-29HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/5/2018
2018-03-28HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/29/2018
2018-03-27HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2018-03-21HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/27/2018
2018-03-21HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-03-14HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/21/2018
2018-03-14HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/21/2018
2018-03-07HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/14/2018
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2018-03-07HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-02-28HousePlaced on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/7/2018
2018-02-27HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-02-27HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2018-02-21HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/27/2018
2018-02-05HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2018-02-01HouseP2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2018-01-31HouseIntro., P1C.
2018-01-30HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB2005 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 855

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback