TN HB2067 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-17 - Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-17 - Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Food Freedom Act." - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 43; Title 53 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Food Freedom Act." - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 43; Title 53 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/17/2020 |
2020-06-16 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-16 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/16/2020 |
2020-06-16 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-06-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-11 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2020-06-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 6/11/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/10/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-06-09 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 6/10/2020 |
2020-06-02 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 6/2/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Meeting Canceled. Reset on Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee cal. for 3/10/20 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2020-02-05 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2020-02-03 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2005 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee