TN HB2063 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Student Free Speech Protection Act"; requires the governing boards of each state institution to adopt the freedom of speech and expression policy to protect student speech and activity. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Student Free Speech Protection Act"; requires the governing boards of each state institution to adopt the freedom of speech and expression policy to protect student speech and activity. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7, Part 1.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-16HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning
2016-03-09HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/15/2016
2016-03-01HouseReset on Final cal. of Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
2016-02-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/1/2016
2016-02-22HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2016-02-08HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2016-02-04HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2016-02-01HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2016-01-27HouseAssigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
2016-01-25HouseP2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning--Government Operations for review
2016-01-21HouseIntro., P1C.
2016-01-20HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB2235 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback