TN HB2062 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Pub. Ch. 630
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Pub. Ch. 630
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, allows the governing board of a public institution of higher education to employ a law enforcement officer in the same manner as a public institution of higher education governed by the board. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7.
Title
As enacted, allows the governing board of a public institution of higher education to employ a law enforcement officer in the same manner as a public institution of higher education governed by the board. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Carter [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Jim Coley [R] | Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R] |
Rep. David Hawk [R] | Rep. John DeBerry [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Pub. Ch. 630 | |
2020-04-06 | Effective date(s) 03/20/2020 | |
2020-03-20 | Signed by Governor. | |
2020-03-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2020-03-09 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-03-06 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-02-25 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-02-24 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-02-20 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/24/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/20/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 2/19/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education |
2020-02-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 2/11/2020 |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee |
2020-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2020-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2340 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 630