TN HB2058 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Failed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Failed in Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Failed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Failed in Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates offense of recklessly leaving a loaded firearm unattended and readily accessible to a child under 13 years of age; creates certain defense. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
As introduced, creates offense of recklessly leaving a loaded firearm unattended and readily accessible to a child under 13 years of age; creates certain defense. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-22 - House - CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Failed in Civil Justice Committee (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | House | Failed in Civil Justice Committee |
2016-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/22/2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2016-03-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/16/2016 |
2016-03-02 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/16/2016 |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/2/2016 |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2016-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2016-01-21 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-20 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2294 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee