TN HB2055 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-10 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department of revenue to destroy tobacco products that are seized or confiscated as contraband goods instead of selling to the highest bidder and paying the proceeds into the state treasury. - Amends TCA Title 43 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, requires the department of revenue to destroy tobacco products that are seized or confiscated as contraband goods instead of selling to the highest bidder and paying the proceeds into the state treasury. - Amends TCA Title 43 and Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2869 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-09 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.