TN HB2055 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-05 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-05 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases from 10 to 12 days the deadline for requesting a formal hearing before the commissioner on adverse action proposed or taken to implement any revenue regulatory or registration law administered by the commissioner, not including those laws relating to assessments or levies of taxes, fees, fines, penalties, interest, or the waiver of penalties. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
As introduced, increases from 10 to 12 days the deadline for requesting a formal hearing before the commissioner on adverse action proposed or taken to implement any revenue regulatory or registration law administered by the commissioner, not including those laws relating to assessments or levies of taxes, fees, fines, penalties, interest, or the waiver of penalties. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2018-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-30 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2061 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee