TN HB2052 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-18 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-18 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, provides an example of the type of entity that falls within the definition of the term "private nonprofit college or university," for purposes of the tax exemption where the title holder of certain tangible personal property used by a contractor or subcontractor is a private nonprofit college or university. - Amends TCA Section 67-6-209.
Title
As introduced, provides an example of the type of entity that falls within the definition of the term "private nonprofit college or university," for purposes of the tax exemption where the title holder of certain tangible personal property used by a contractor or subcontractor is a private nonprofit college or university. - Amends TCA Section 67-6-209.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Lynn [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-06-18 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2020-06-18 | House | Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-06-16 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 6/18/2020 |
2020-06-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/16/2020 |
2020-06-16 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-16 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 6/16/2020 |
2020-06-16 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/15/2020 |
2020-06-10 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/10/2020 |
2020-06-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 6/10/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 6/3/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-11 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2020-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2506 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-11 - Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ recommendation