TN HB2052 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 887
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Pub. Ch. 887
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies circumstances under which a trust may be construed as a total return unitrust. - Amends TCA Title 35, Chapter 6.
Title
As enacted, clarifies circumstances under which a trust may be construed as a total return unitrust. - Amends TCA Title 35, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Pub. Ch. 887 | |
2018-05-08 | Effective date(s) 05/03/2018 | |
2018-05-03 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-04-26 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-23 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-20 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 27, Nays 0 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA1057) |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-04-12 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2018-04-12 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-12 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA1112) |
2018-04-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-04 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/5/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/3/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2018-02-05 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2018-02-05 | House | Sponsor change. |
2018-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-30 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2172 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-08 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 887