TN HB2043 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 951
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 951
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, removes provision whereby a person who provides prayer in lieu of medical or surgical treatment could not be charged with the crime of child abuse, neglect, or endangerment solely for that reason. - Amends TCA Section 39-15-402.
Title
As enacted, removes provision whereby a person who provides prayer in lieu of medical or surgical treatment could not be charged with the crime of child abuse, neglect, or endangerment solely for that reason. - Amends TCA Section 39-15-402.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 951 | |
2016-04-14 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2016-04-13 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/14/2016 |
2016-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/13/2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/16/2016 |
2016-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/8/2016 |
2016-03-01 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/8/2016 |
2016-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/1/2016 |
2016-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2016-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2016-01-21 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2016-01-20 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1761 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 951