TN HB2042 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/11/2020
Pending: House Public Service & Employees Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/11/2020
Pending: House Public Service & Employees Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires law enforcement agencies to preserve dashboard camera video recordings a minimum of two years for motor vehicle accidents involving a law enforcement vehicle that results in injury to or death of any person. - Amends TCA Title 38.
Title
As introduced, requires law enforcement agencies to preserve dashboard camera video recordings a minimum of two years for motor vehicle accidents involving a law enforcement vehicle that results in injury to or death of any person. - Amends TCA Title 38.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Action Def. in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee to 3/11/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee |
2020-02-03 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2020-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-01-29 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2263 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee