TN HB2039 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes a mechanism to fund scholarships for municipal financial officer candidates to receive certification and continuing education post-certification. - Amends TCA Title 6, Chapter 56, Part 4 and Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 6, Chapter 56, Part 4 and Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 2, relative to funding scholarships for certified municipal finance officers.
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Carr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Action Def. in s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee to 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Cities & Counties Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Cities & Counties Subcommittee |
2022-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2022-01-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1985 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/27/2022