TN HB2037 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-01 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-01 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases from a Class A misdemeanor to a Class C felony the offenses of unlawful purchase by or unlawful sale to a person who is prohibited by state or federal law from owning, possessing, or purchasing a firearm; prohibits the purchase or sale of ammunition by or to such a person; prohibits the transfer or sale of a firearm or ammunition to a person receiving treatment at a treatment resource for mental illness or serious emotional disturbance and not just when the person is receiving inpatient treatment. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13, relative to firearms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | House | Withdrawn. |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2024-01-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee - Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2024-01-23 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1819 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-05 - Withdrawn.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2037&ga=113 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/113/Bill/HB2037.pdf |